Case Information: 33453 | |||
Short Caption: | NOE (SINDI) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR981565 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/10/1998 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/10/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 98-00323 | |
12/21/1998 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 98-00458 | |
12/21/1998 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 98-00459 | |
01/08/1999 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation to Withdraw Fast Track Statement. | 99-00105 | |
01/25/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Stipulation Approved. The clerk shall strike the fast track statement filed on December 21, 1998. fn1 [The joint appendix filed on December 21, 1998 shall not be stricken.] Appellant shall file and serve an amended fast track statement within 15 days of this order. | 99-00499 | |
01/29/1999 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 99-00634 | |
02/05/1999 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 99-00836 | |
03/31/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99A-WM/DA/NB | 99-02401 | |
04/27/1999 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 99-03320 | |
04/27/1999 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/12/1999 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 4, 1999. | 99-03320 |