judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00624-CV
14-89-00624-CV
07/05/1989
Divorce
Rinehold, Karen Elizabeth
Rinehold, Michael Alan
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/18/1990Case stored
07/09/1990Mandate Issued
07/09/1990Mandate Issued
06/08/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
05/24/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/24/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/15/1990Submitted
05/15/1990Submission
05/15/1990Submitted
04/23/1990Submission
09/05/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/05/1989Case ready to be set
09/05/1989Case ready to be set
08/09/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/10/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
07/05/1989Transcript FILED
07/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/11/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeBruce R. Steffler
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantDavid Frishman
Trial Court Information
247th District Court
Harris
Honorable CHARLES DEAN HUCKABEE
83-32076