judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00623-CV
14-89-00623-CV
07/05/1989
No description available.
First Heights PSA
The Moody Corp., Et Al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/27/1990Case stored
05/24/1990Mandate Issued
05/24/1990Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STAGRANTED
05/24/1990Opinion issuedDISMISSED
05/24/1990Opinion issuedDISMISSED
05/24/1990Mandate Issued
05/16/1990Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA
05/11/1990Submission
01/11/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/11/1990Case ready to be set
01/11/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/11/1990Case ready to be set
12/27/1989Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
12/27/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/04/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/30/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/15/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/25/1989Notice of Removal received and filed
09/07/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
08/24/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/17/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
08/17/1989No description available.
08/09/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
08/09/1989Supplemental transcript RECEIVED - ANT,APE,STA
08/04/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
07/27/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
07/13/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
07/05/1989Transcript FILED
07/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/05/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/27/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantHon. Steven Kearney
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeRobert R. Burford
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleePaul J. Dobrowski
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantLeymon L. Solomon
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeHon. Robert N. Brailas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantLouis K. Bonham
Trial Court Information
190th District Court
Harris
88-53882