judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00790-CR
05-89-00790-CR
07/05/1989
Forgery
Bruce, Don Lee
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/10/2020Order enteredDestroy
01/11/1991Mandate Issued
01/11/1991Mandate Issued
12/20/1990Case Returned from Higher Ct.
09/04/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
08/24/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
07/30/1990Response to Motion
07/19/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/11/1990Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
07/11/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/11/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/02/1990Letter Sent by the Court
04/02/1990Order Entered
03/26/1990Letter Sent by the Court
03/22/1990Brief Filed
03/22/1990Case ready to be set
03/22/1990Case ready to be set
03/16/1990Brief Filed
03/14/1990Findings of Fact & Conclusion of Law Filed
02/21/1990Order Entered
01/17/1990Motion for Relief Filed
10/09/1989Case ready to be set
10/09/1989Letter Sent by the Court
09/07/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/06/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/30/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/07/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
08/07/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/07/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/07/1989Supplemental Transcript filed
07/24/1989Order Entered
07/12/1989Letter Sent by the Court
07/05/1989Transcript Filed
07/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/16/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
05/08/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/10/2020Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
199th Judicial District Court
Collin
Honorable John R. Roach
F86-426-HR
2 yrs TDC Prob. Revoked