judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0991-89
PD-0991-89
07/10/1989
PDR Case Type
FOUNTAIN, WILEY EDWARD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/30/1990FINAL DISPRefused
03/14/1990PDR DISPRefused
08/09/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/10/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/09/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Fountain, Wiley EdwardApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Wiley Edward Fountain
Court of Appeals Information:
05-86-00941-CR
Aff 4-7-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
283rd District Court
Dallas
Honorable JACK HAMPTON
F86-83596-RT