judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-8832
C-8832
07/10/1989
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
THE CITY OF HEARNE ACTING BY AND THROUGH ITS CITY COUNCIL
THE HONORABLE ROBERT STEM JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
07/10/1989Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/29/1989list missing briefs when case is separated(remarksENTIRE RECORD MISSING WHEN SEPARATED
09/28/1989Case StoredNO REHEARING FILED
07/17/1989M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruled
07/17/1989Motion for temporary relief disposedOverruled
07/10/1989Brief in Support of Petition
07/10/1989Exhibits received
07/10/1989Motion for temporary relief
07/10/1989Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
07/10/1989No description available.
07/10/1989Petition for writ received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
09/28/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
AGUIRRE, EMMETTRelatorMr. Arthur L. Walker
LASTOR, DOROTHY JORespondentMr. Bryan F. Russ III
GENTRY, REGINALDRelatorMr. Arthur L. Walker
GRIFFIN, NOLANRelatorMr. Arthur L. Walker
MCDANIEL, BILLYRelatorMr. Arthur L. Walker
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
82nd District Court
Robertson
Honorable David W. Stem
88-12-13,572-CV