judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00641-CR
14-89-00641-CR
07/10/1989
Other Drug Possession
Yee, Christopher Ken
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/25/1991Case stored
10/24/1991Mandate Issued
10/24/1991Mandate Issued
10/09/1991Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDDISMISSED
09/18/1991Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STADENIED
06/26/1991Opinion issuedDISMISSED
09/12/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDGRANTED
06/15/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
06/13/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
05/17/1990Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
05/08/1990Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
04/26/1990Opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
04/26/1990Opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
04/26/1990Opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
04/04/1990Submitted
04/04/1990Submission
04/04/1990Submitted
03/08/1990Submission
02/16/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/16/1990Case ready to be set
02/16/1990Case ready to be set
01/25/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/25/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/18/1990Brf.RECD.No Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA,
01/18/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/17/1990No description available.
01/11/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/21/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/19/1989No description available.
12/14/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/24/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/17/1989No description available.
11/02/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/27/1989No description available.
10/25/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/14/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
08/31/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
08/31/1989Extend time to file transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APEGRANTED
08/31/1989Transcript FILED
08/21/1989Extend time to file transcript FILED-ANT,APE
08/17/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
08/17/1989Transcript received only; mtn. pending
07/10/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/07/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
06/15/1989Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/25/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantMichael B. Charlton
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasAlan Curry
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
232nd District Court
Harris
Honorable JERIN T. JAMES
523.656
75 yrs. TDC & $100,000