judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00633-CV
14-89-00633-CV
07/10/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Tesoro Petroleum
Don Smith and Channel Solvents, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/04/1990Mandate Issued
07/11/1990Writ of Error FILED
06/22/1990Writ of Error FILED
05/24/1990Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
05/03/1990Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
04/19/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
04/19/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
03/20/1990Submitted
03/20/1990Submission
03/20/1990Submitted
02/26/1990Submission
10/30/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/30/1989Case ready to be set
10/30/1989Case ready to be set
10/05/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
09/18/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/24/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAMOOT
08/18/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/03/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/27/1989Exhibits FILED
07/27/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
07/27/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
07/19/1989Exhibits received
07/17/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
07/10/1989Transcript FILED
07/10/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/07/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
04/13/1989Motion for new trial FILED
03/17/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/11/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantHon. David Bensey
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeRay Epps
Trial Court Information
190th District Court
Harris
88-50541