judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00804-CR
05-89-00804-CR
07/10/1989
Burglary
Potts, Lee Don
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/18/2000Record RetentionRetain
03/27/1991Mandate Issued
03/27/1991Mandate Issued
03/15/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
12/10/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
11/12/1990Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCA
10/15/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/15/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/18/1990Submission
09/18/1990Submitted
09/18/1990Submission
09/18/1990Submitted
06/29/1990MattConv
03/08/1990Brief Filed
03/08/1990Case ready to be set
03/08/1990Case ready to be set
02/26/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/22/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/02/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/01/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/04/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/02/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/07/1989Brief Filed
11/20/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/07/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/06/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/05/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/05/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/28/1989Transcript Filed
07/10/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/10/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/06/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/27/1991Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
283rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
F89-80754-JT
55 yrs TDC