judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1015-89
PD-1015-89
07/11/1989
PDR Case Type
MILLER, RONNIE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/04/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/11/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/11/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/01/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Miller, RonnieApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Walter C. Prentice
STATE OF TEXASStateRonald Earle
Court of Appeals Information:
03-88-00033-CR
Aff 4-26-89
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
331st District Court
Travis
Honorable BOB PERKINS
90,183