judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1009-89
PD-1009-89
07/11/1989
PDR Case Type
JEFFERSON, LAPACA JOE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/06/1989FINAL DISPRefused
09/20/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/11/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/11/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/16/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
JEFFERSON, LAPACA JOEApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Ross Teter
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00531-CR
Remanded 4-18-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 2 of Dallas County
Dallas
Honorable LARRY W. BARAKA
F87-78465-JI