judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-89-00317-CR
04-89-00317-CR
07/10/1989
Habeas Corpus
The State of Texas
Nancy M. Kost
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/10/1998Letter of Inquiry Filed
06/22/1990Mandate Issued
06/22/1990Mandate Issued
06/21/1990Case Returned from Higher Court
05/23/1990Higher Court DecisionRefused
04/06/1990No New Event but Update in Calendar
04/04/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
03/22/1990Petition for Review Filed
02/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/14/1989Submitted
12/14/1989Submission
12/14/1989Submitted
12/11/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/07/1989Motion Filed
11/14/1989Submission
10/19/1989Reply brief filed
09/26/1989Brief Filed
09/26/1989Case ready to be set
09/26/1989Case ready to be set
09/18/1989Information regarding cause received
09/01/1989Brief Filed
08/04/1989No Description Available.
07/21/1989No Description Available.
07/20/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/13/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/12/1989Appealable Order signed in Trial Court
07/10/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/05/1989Motion Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/22/1990Case StoredCase stored
06/22/2015RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Trial JudgeINTERESTED PARTY
Mr. Manuel ContrerasINTERESTED PARTYManuel Contreras
Nancy M. KostAppelleeBrock Huffman
Unknown UserCriminal - AppellantBarbara Hervey
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 8
Bexar
Honorable Miguel Rodriguez
427536
unknown