judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL C. STEWART V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1310
Short Caption:MICHAEL C. STEWART V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Lead:10-CO-1310Consolidated: 10-CO-1311
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL204-96Filed Date:10/19/2010

Opening Event Date:10/19/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/17/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/29/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/22/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/14/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael C. Stewart YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Angela Pegram Saffoe YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/19/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/04/2010ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 10-CO-1310 and 10-CO-1311 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record indexes and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
11/17/2010RECORD INDEX (10CO1311)
11/17/2010RECORD COPIES (10CO1311)
11/17/2010RECORD INDEX (10CO1310)
11/17/2010RECORD COPIES (10CO1310)
11/17/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/19/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (CASTILLO)
01/11/2011 On consideration of this court's order of November 19, 2010, directing appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
01/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days.
01/21/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF due to Lock Down status.
02/03/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF
02/03/2011RECEIVED Appellant's Biref and appendix
02/24/2011ORD GRANT APLT MOTIONS to extend time to file brief and the lodged brief of appellant and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
02/24/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF/appendix
03/28/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until April 29, 2011
04/25/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before April 29, 2011. (By: JAC)
04/29/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/29/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/05/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
05/18/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/18/2011FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)
11/01/2011FiledOrder Denying pro se aplt's motion to present oral argument.
11/22/2011FiledSubmitted To Blackburne-Rigsby,Oberly,Schwelb
01/19/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.) ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal is affirmed.
02/14/2012FiledMandate
07/09/2012FiledMotion To RECALL THE MANDATEDenied Without Prejudice
07/23/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE
09/28/2012FiledLetter From appellant regarding the 7/23/2012 Motion to Recall the Mandate (Appellant)
11/08/2012FiledLetter From appellant regarding the 7/23/2012 Motion to Recall the Mandate (Appellant)
04/26/2013FiledORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE