judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WIKER VS. WIKER

Case Information: 33447
Short Caption:WIKER VS. WIKERCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 41226
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D205178
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D225028
Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/23/1998 / Paustian, KathleenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/14/1999How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/10/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kenneth L. Hall--check no. 2132.
12/10/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00314
12/17/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00401
12/23/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kathleen M. Paustian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/04/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: dated October 28, 1998. To Court Reporter: Deborah S. Casper, Transcript Video Services. 99-00015
02/04/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-00806
02/05/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 10/28/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Deborah S. Casper. 99-00840
02/17/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nevertheless, the briefing and request for transcripts shall remain suspended pending a jurisdictional review and further order of this court. 99-01064
02/24/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Lift Stay and Expedite Hearing. 99-01255
03/15/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellants:40 days to file opening brief and appendix. Respondent shall have 20 days from service of the opening brief to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant shall then have 10 days from service of the answering brief to file and serve any reply brief. NRAP 31(a)(2). fn1 On February 24, 1999, appellant filed a motion to reinstate briefing in this matter and to expedite the resolution of this appeal. We deny appellant's motion as moot. 99-01815
03/22/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 3/19/99. 99-02045
03/22/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Mailed on: 3/19/99. 99-02046
04/12/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 4/9/99. 99-02730
04/23/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 4/21/99. 99-03198
06/24/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Expedite Hearing. 99-05546
06/24/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Errata to Respondent's Answering Brief. (Inserted corrected Page 4 into the original and two copies of the Respondent's Answering Brief). 99-05558
10/14/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. fn1[In light of this order we deny appellant's motion to expedite the hearing of this matter. The court will, however, make every effort to resolve this appeal as expeditiously as possible]. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-09986
10/14/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Case submitted on the briefs this day to the Southern Nevada Panel.
12/20/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. " . . . we reverse the district court's order denying appellant's motion to set aside the divorce decree and remand this matter to the district court with instructions to grant appellant's NRCP 60(b) motion, set aside the divorce decree, and institute further proceedings." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-12859
01/18/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-00684
01/18/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/28/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 21, 2000. 00-00684