judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MEEKA FIELDS and RICHARD T. FIELDS v. LAURIE MOELLER-WATERHOUSE, d/b/a LAURIE INTERIORS, and LAURIE LOCHRIDGE, INC., a Wyoming corporation

Case Heading (S-08-0146)
Case Number:S-08-0146Case Docketed On:07/07/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law
Short Title:MEEKA FIELDS and RICHARD T. FIELDS v. LAURIE MOELLER-WATERHOUSE, d/b/a LAURIE INTERIORS, and LAURIE LOCHRIDGE, INC., a Wyoming corporation
Full Title:MEEKA FIELDS and RICHARD T. FIELDS, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. LAURIE MOELLER-WATERHOUSE, d/b/a LAURIE INTERIORS, and LAURIE LOCHRIDGE, INC., a Wyoming corporation, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMeeka FieldsAndrea L. Richard
AppellantRichard T. FieldsAndrea L. Richard
AppelleeLaurie Moeller-WaterhouseJoseph F. Moore Jr.
AppelleeLaurie Lochridge, Inc. a Wyoming corporationJoseph F. Moore Jr.

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/07/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/07/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/07/2008Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice GoldenNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
08/25/2008Event - Phone Call - received call from Andrea Richard indicating that the matter has been settled and they will be dismissing. Requesting correspondence from her so that we do not dismiss for want of prosecution.EventPhone CallFinal
08/25/2008Correspondence - Incoming - letter indicating that case has been settled.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
09/03/2008Event - Phone Call - contacted Ms. Richard's office and requested electronic filing of stipulation for dismissal.EventPhone CallFinal
09/11/2008Motion - Dismiss - stipulatedMotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
09/12/2008Event - Hardcopy received joint stipulation for dismissal with prejudiceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/12/2008Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
09/12/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal