Case Information: 33448 | |||
Short Caption: | STROZZI VS. KORIN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A381911 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 12/23/1998 / Paustian, Kathleen | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/03/2000 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/10/1998 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Eglet & Prince--check no. 4260. | ||
12/10/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 98-00315 | |
12/23/1998 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kathleen M. Paustian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
12/28/1998 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 98-00516 | |
02/22/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 99-01174 | |
02/26/1999 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellants: 15 days to file a transcript /no transcript request; 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 99-01314 | |
04/09/1999 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 11/16/98. To Court Reporter: Patsy Smith. | 99-02712 | |
05/19/1999 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. 11/16/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Patsy K. Smith. | 99-04144 | |
06/25/1999 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 6/24/99. | 99-05573 | |
06/25/1999 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 99-05574 | |
07/26/1999 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: August 25, 1999. | 99-06716 | |
08/27/1999 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: 8/25/99. | 99-08066 | |
09/17/1999 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: October 25, 1999. | 99-08830 | |
10/25/1999 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 10/23/99. | 99-10402 | |
04/03/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Submitted date: 04/03/00. | 00-05280 | |
04/03/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/09/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Remand. We conclude that the district court abused its discretion in striking appellant's request for a trial de novo. "We therefore reverse the district court's order and remand this matter to the district court for further proceedings." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 00-09769 | |
07/06/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-11436 | |
07/06/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/23/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 11, 2000. | 00-11436 |