Case Information: 10-CO-1311 | |||
Short Caption: | MICHAEL C. STEWART V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief |
Lead: | 10-CO-1310 | Consolidated: | 10-CO-1311 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | FEL6595-96 | Filed Date: | 10/19/2010 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 10/19/2010 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 11/17/2010 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 04/29/2011 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 11/22/2011 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 02/14/2012 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Michael C. Stewart | Y | Pro Se | N | ||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
10/19/2010 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
11/04/2010 | ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 10-CO-1310 and 10-CO-1311 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record indexes and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC) | |||
11/17/2010 | RECORD INDEX (10CO1311) | |||
11/17/2010 | RECORD COPIES (10CO1311) | |||
11/17/2010 | RECORD INDEX (10CO1310) | |||
11/17/2010 | RECORD COPIES (10CO1310) | |||
11/17/2010 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
11/19/2010 | It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (CASTILLO) | |||
01/11/2011 | On consideration of this court's order of November 19, 2010, directing appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo) | |||
01/11/2011 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days. | |||
01/21/2011 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF due to Lock Down status. | |||
02/03/2011 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF | |||
02/03/2011 | RECEIVED Appellant's Biref and appendix | |||
02/24/2011 | ORD GRANT APLT MOTIONS to extend time to file brief and the lodged brief of appellant and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC) | |||
02/24/2011 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF/appendix | |||
03/28/2011 | APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until April 29, 2011 | |||
04/25/2011 | On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before April 29, 2011. (By: JAC) | |||
04/29/2011 | APPELLEE'S BRIEF | |||
04/29/2011 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
05/05/2011 | Filed | Final Screening - Summary | ||
05/18/2011 | APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF | |||
10/04/2011 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | ||
10/18/2011 | Filed | Motion Requesting Argument (Appellant) | ||
11/01/2011 | Filed | Order Denying pro se aplt's motion to present oral argument. | ||
11/22/2011 | Filed | Submitted To Blackburne-Rigsby,Oberly,Schwelb | ||
01/19/2012 | Filed | Affirmed (OPINION) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.) ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal is affirmed. | ||
02/14/2012 | Filed | Mandate | ||
07/09/2012 | Filed | Motion To RECALL THE MANDATE | Denied Without Prejudice | |
07/23/2012 | Filed | TMC//MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE | ||
09/28/2012 | Filed | Letter From appellant regarding the 7/23/2012 Motion to Recall the Mandate (Appellant) | ||
11/08/2012 | Filed | Letter From appellant regarding the 7/23/2012 Motion to Recall the Mandate (Appellant) | ||
04/26/2013 | Filed | ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE |