judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0983-89
PD-0983-89
07/10/1989
PDR Case Type
HAYES, RUBIN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/14/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/15/1989FINAL DISPRefused
08/30/1989PDR DISPRefused
07/14/1989RESPONSE FILED
07/10/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/25/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateRichard L. Hattox
HAYES, RUBINApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)N. R. Stevenson
Tom Crum
Court of Appeals Information:
02-88-00291-CR
Aff 5-18-89
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
355th District Court
Hood
Honorable RALPH H. WALTON, JR.
5692