judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00639-CR
14-89-00639-CR
07/10/1989
Other Drug Possession
Kessell, Terry
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/21/1990Case stored
07/26/1990Mandate Issued
07/26/1990Mandate Issued
07/10/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
06/13/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
03/27/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
03/09/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
02/23/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
02/08/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
02/08/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/30/1990Submitted
01/30/1990Submission
01/30/1990Submitted
01/03/1990Submission
11/30/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/30/1989Case ready to be set
11/30/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/30/1989Case ready to be set
11/20/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/07/1989Exhibits FILED
10/26/1989Mtn.supplement record DISPOSED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STAGRANTED
10/26/1989Order Entered
10/23/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/16/1989Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
10/13/1989Mtn.to supplement record FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STA
10/13/1989Objection to record FILED
09/14/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
09/11/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/14/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
08/07/1989Transcript FILED
07/10/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/03/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
06/16/1989Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/22/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantMichael P. Fosher
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasWinston E. Cochran, Jr.
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
208th District Court
Harris
Honorable JERIN T. JAMES
514,855
50 yrs. TDC