judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals

Case: 12-89-00170-CV
12-89-00170-CV
07/10/1989
Contract
Deltex Petroleum Corp., f/k/a Saxton Petroleum Corporation
Roosth, Isadore, Trustee
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/27/2002Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
10/20/1989ACKNOWLEDGMENT CARD RECEIVED FROM APPEAL COURT
10/17/1989Mandate Issued
10/02/1989
09/15/1989
08/31/1989No Description Available.Dismissed
08/31/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
08/31/1989Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/31/1989Case ready to be set
08/31/1989Submission
08/31/1989Submitted
08/04/1989Motion to Dismiss Appeal Filed
08/02/1989Letter from the Court
07/10/1989No Description Available.
07/10/1989Exhibit(s) filed
07/10/1989
07/10/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/18/1989Surety Bond Filed
05/10/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/27/2002Case DestroyedCase Destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
241st District Court
Smith
Honorable Alvin G Khoury
87-2053-C