Case Information: 98-CV-1438 | |||
Short Caption: | ROBBIE DYKES V. LANI JACKSON-PINKNEY | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CA9823-96 | Filed Date: | 09/23/1998 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 09/23/1998 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 03/09/1999 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Robbie Dykes | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Lani Jackson-Pinkney | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | District of Columbia | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
09/23/1998 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
10/06/1998 | ORDER On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in the above-referenced matter, and in accordance with D.C. App. R. 7A(b), it is ORDERED that counsel for the parties shall appear before Senior Judge John W. Kern, III, for a status conference at 11:00 a.m. on Friday, October 16, 1998, in the Catherine B. Kelly Hearing Room, located on the sixth floor, 500 Indiana Avenue Avenue, N.W., Washington, D.C., to identify and narrow the issues on appeal, to discuss the status of record and transcript ordering and preparation, and to discuss other matters that may affect either the calendaring of the case or the efficient presentation of the issues on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for the appellant shall present to Senior Judge John W. Kern, III, copies of the designation of record, and statement regarding transcript, which copies shall be stamped by the Appeals Coordinator's Office to reflect that said documents have been filed in that office. Counsel shall also present at the status conference a copy of the docketing statement which is required to be filed in this court. See D.C. App. Rules 10(a), 10(c) and 7A(a). Any such documents filed in this court more than 10 days after the filing of the notice of appeal must be accompanied by a motion for leave to file the documents out of time, and this court's motion fee. See D.C. App. R. 27. Failure to appear or to present these documents shall constitute grounds for dismissal of the appeal(s) and other appropriate sanctions. (AMW) | |||
10/14/1998 | APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL | |||
10/21/1998 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS | |||
10/21/1998 | $50.00 DOCKETING FEE | |||
10/21/1998 | RECEIVED - ADS, DR & SRT | |||
10/21/1998 | MOTION(S) FEE PAID | |||
10/22/1998 | APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION - aple's motion to dismiss | |||
10/28/1998 | APPELLEE'S REPLY to appellant's opposition to appellee's motion to dismiss appeal. | |||
11/05/1998 | RECORD ON APPEAL | |||
11/06/1998 | SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD | |||
11/09/1998 | APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for leave to file a surreply in opposition to aple's reply motion to dismiss appeal | |||
11/09/1998 | RECEIVED - aplt's surreply in opposition to aple's reply motion to dismiss appeal | |||
11/09/1998 | MOTION(S) FEE PAID | |||
11/25/1998 | RECEIVED - sup crt ltr re record pick-up | |||
12/01/1998 | TMC - Aple's motion to dismiss appeal - Aplt's opposition to motion to dismiss - Aple's reply to motion to dismiss - Aplt's motion for leave to file documents - Aplt's motion for leave to file surreply - Aplt's surreply (Lodged) - Aplt's motion for leave to file documents - Aplt's docketing statement, designation of record & statement regarding transcript (lodged) | |||
02/12/1999 | ORDER GRANT APLE MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL and this appeal is hereby dismissed. *** MORE *** | |||
02/12/1999 | ORDER DENYING APLT MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION nunc pro tunc to file docketing statement and designation of record AS MOOT. (by: RDKNMK) | |||
02/12/1999 | ORDER DENYING APLT MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for leave to file a surreply. *** MORE *** | |||
02/12/1999 | DISMISSED | |||
03/09/1999 | MANDATE ISSUED |