judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DONALD J. McDONALD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0166)
Case Number:S-08-0166Case Docketed On:08/04/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:DONALD J. McDONALD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DONALD J. McDONALD, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDonald J. McDonald Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/04/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/04/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/20/2008Order - Dismiss - jurisdictionOrderDismiss - jurisdictionFinal
08/27/2008Motion - ReinstatementMotionReinstatement of caseFinal
09/02/2008Correspondence - Incoming from appellantCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
09/15/2008Order - Denying petition to reinstate appeal.OrderDenyFinal
09/15/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal