judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TENACITY 919 L STREET, LLC V. GLORIA HIGHTOWER

Case Information: 10-CV-1326
Short Caption:TENACITY 919 L STREET, LLC V. GLORIA HIGHTOWERClassification:Appeals - Civil - Contracts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB524-07Filed Date:10/22/2010

Opening Event Date:10/22/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/29/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/28/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTenacity 919 L Street, LLCN
John J. HathwayNN
AppelleeGloria Hightower N
John F. Pressley, Jr.NY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/22/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/05/2010STATEMENT OF ISSUE(S) aplt *(to determine whether trial court had the authority to grant the motion to reopen and enter stay filed in the trial court. (elp)
11/05/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 11/21/08) (elp)
11/22/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CUASE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-APPEALABLE ORDER. See DC Code 11-721 (2001). (BY: ETW)
11/22/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC - ROTSC (appellee)
12/10/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
12/17/2010APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE to aplt's show cause.
12/21/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (11-pgs/tape 11/21/08 proc)w/cd
12/29/2010RECORD INDEX
12/29/2010RECORD COMPLETED
01/06/2011 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction as having been taken from a NON-APPEALABLE ORDER. (BRTEFA) (jl)
01/06/2011DISMISSED
01/28/2011MANDATE ISSUED