judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TOWNSEND (DARREN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33469
Short Caption:TOWNSEND (DARREN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 42503
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C147825Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/14/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/14/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/14/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00369
01/19/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Remand for Designation of Counsel. We remand for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. If indigent, the district court shall have 30 days to appoint counsel. Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and enter an appearance in the district court. Within 5 days from the appointment or appearance the district court clerk shall : (1) transmit to this court a copy of the district court's written or minute orde; and (2) serve a copy of this order of remand on appellant's counsel. Thereafter, counsel shall have 10 days to enter an appearance with this court. fn1 [All filing deadlines shall commence to run from the dte on which counsel is required to enter an appearance in this court.] 99-00336
02/25/1999Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on appointing Robert E. Glennen as counsel for appellant. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel). 99-01291
03/05/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 09/21/98 to 09/24/98 and 11/17/98 Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Tina Shaffner. 99-01571
03/05/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Robert E. Glennen III representing appellant. 99-01572
04/01/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed upon counsel. 99-02418
04/07/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-02613
05/05/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 09/22/98, Vols. I and II; 09/23/98, Vols. III and IV; and 09/24/98, Vol. V Proceedings: Court Reporter: Arlene Blazi. 99-03588
07/06/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 99-05939
02/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall, within 15 days of the date of this order, file and serve the opening brief or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant. Respondent shall, within 30 days of service of the opening brief, file and serve the answering brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-01700
02/22/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 2/22/00. 00-02799
03/24/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 33 pages. 00-04736
03/24/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No Postmark. 00-04775
03/24/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-04776
11/14/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 00-19913
11/14/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Submitted to the Northern Nevada Panel.
12/21/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's judgment of conviction and sentence." -NNP00A-MS/DA/ML. 00-22229
01/09/2001Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: January 5, 2001. 01-00494
01/18/2001Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 01-01097
01/25/2001Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Mailed on: 1/23/01--LV drop box. 01-01631
02/05/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-01197
02/05/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/08/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 13, 2001. 01-01197
05/09/2001Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. " . . . we deny the petition." EN BANC-WM/CY/MS/DA/RR/ML/NB 01-07721