Case Heading (S-08-0167) | |||||
Case Number: | S-08-0167 | Case Docketed On: | 08/04/2008 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Fifth Judicial District Park County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury | ||
Short Title: | KENNETH HALL v. BILL PERRY and HIDDEN CREEK OUTFITTERS | ||||
Full Title: | KENNETH HALL, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. BILL PERRY and HIDDEN CREEK OUTFITTERS, Appellees (Defendants). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Kenneth Hall | Matthew David Winslow |
Appellee | Bill Perry | Patrick J. Murphy Lori Lei Gorseth |
Appellee | Hidden Creek Outfitters | Patrick J. Murphy Lori Lei Gorseth |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Contracts, Negligence |
Opinion Number: | 2009 WY 83 |
Citation: | 211 P.3d 489 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
08/04/2008 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
08/04/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
08/04/2008 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
08/04/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
09/16/2008 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
09/17/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received - appellant's brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
10/31/2008 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
11/03/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee and received copy of designation of record | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
11/04/2008 | Brief - Other - received replacement page 21 with original signature | Brief | Other | Final | |
11/14/2008 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
11/14/2008 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
11/17/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
11/17/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received Appellant's Reply Brief and received copy of designation of record | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
11/19/2008 | Motion - Oral argument - vacate | Motion | Oral argument - vacate | Final | |
11/19/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick Murphy for appellee. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
11/21/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received - motion to vacate and reset oral argument. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
11/21/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Matthew Winslow for appellant. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
11/21/2008 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, one volume, Original Papers | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
11/21/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Record filed | Notice-Outgoing | Record filed | Final | |
11/21/2008 | Order - Vacating setting for oral argument | Order | Vacating setting for oral argument | Final | |
01/06/2009 | Event - Phone Call - received call from Mr. Murphy requesting that case be sent on February 17th. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
01/09/2009 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
01/13/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Matthew D. Winslow for appellant; and Patrick Murphy for appellee. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
02/17/2009 | Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Matthew David Winslow for appellant; Patrick J. Murphy for appellee) and taken under advisement. | Event | Oral argument presented | Final | |
02/17/2009 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
06/30/2009 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
07/16/2009 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
07/16/2009 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
07/16/2009 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
07/16/2009 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
07/24/2009 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/20/09. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |