judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

C.A. HOOVER AND SON, ET AL. v. O.M. FRANKLIN SERUM COMPANY

Case: B-1426
B-1426
03/13/1969
Application for Writ of Error
C.A. HOOVER AND SON, ET AL.
O.M. FRANKLIN SERUM COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/23/1969Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/03/1969Response to PetitionPetitioner
03/28/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
03/13/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
03/13/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/29/1969Response to Motion filed
07/23/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/09/1969Opinion issued
04/30/1969Document received (See Remarks)
04/03/1969Response to Petition
03/28/1969Response to Petition
03/13/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/13/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/13/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
O.M. Franklin Serum CompanyRespondent
C.A. Hoover and Son, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information