judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5618
B-5618
10/28/1975
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
BOB HAUNSCHILD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/17/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/26/1976Letter brief Petitioner
11/11/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
10/28/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/17/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/26/1976Letter brief
12/24/1975Letter Filed
11/11/1975Response to Petition
10/28/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/28/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bob HaunschildRespondent
Texas Employers Insurance AssociationPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information