judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5637
B-5637
11/10/1975
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF SAN ANTONIO, SAN ANTONIO RIVER AUTHORITY
GARRETT BROTHERS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/26/1976Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
03/19/1976Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/18/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/17/1976Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/24/1975Response to PetitionPetitioner
11/24/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
11/18/1975Response to PetitionPetitioner
11/10/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
11/10/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/26/1976Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
03/19/1976Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/18/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/17/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/24/1975Response to Petition
11/24/1975Response to Petition
11/18/1975Response to Petition
11/10/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/10/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/10/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of HoustonAmicus Curiae
City of San Antonio by and through City Public Service Board of San AntonioPetitioner
Garrett BrothersRespondent
San Antonio River AuthorityPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information