judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5638
B-5638
11/10/1975
Application for Writ of Error
SARAH E. BARTLEY, ET AL.
ROBERT E. SONE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/15/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/16/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
11/26/1975Amended PetitionPetitioner
11/24/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
11/10/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/15/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/16/1975Response to Petition
12/01/1975Response to Motion filed
11/26/1975Amended Petition
11/24/1975Response to Petition
11/12/1975Motion to amend application for writ of errorFiling granted
11/10/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/10/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sarah E. Bartley, et al.Petitioner
Robert E. SoneRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information