judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8121
A-8121
11/29/1960
Application for Writ of Error
DALLAS G. PERKINS
REED INGALSBE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/16/1961Errata Filed
06/28/1961Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/07/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
11/29/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/16/1961Errata Filed
07/25/1961Letter Filed
06/28/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/14/1961Concurring Opinion issued.
06/14/1961Dissenting opinion issued.
06/14/1961Opinion issued
03/08/1961Miscellaneous Motion
02/08/1961Document received (See Remarks)
12/07/1960Response to Petition
11/29/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/29/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dallas G. PerkinsPetitioner
Reed IngalsbeRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information