judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8115
A-8115
11/25/1960
Application for Writ of Error
WILMA D. YOUNG, ET AL.
WESTERN CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/15/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/06/1961Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
02/03/1961Supplemental Brief filedAmicus Curiae
12/12/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
12/02/1960Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/25/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/17/1961Response to Motion filed
03/15/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/06/1961Supplemental Brief filed
02/03/1961Supplemental Brief filed
12/12/1960Response to Petition
12/02/1960Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/25/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
11/25/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tyler and TylerAmicus Curiae
Western Casualty and Surety CompanyRespondent
Wilma D. Young, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information