judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LAMBERT (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33463
Short Caption:LAMBERT (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35153 , 36332 , 40173 , 43782 , 45385 , 46642 , 47394 , 48149 , 50034 , 52183 , 62750 , 71943 , 71943-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C117962Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/01/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/14/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/14/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00356
01/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 33262, 33289, 33318, 33402, 33463, 33464, 33465, 33479, 33480, 33481, 33523. 99-00319
06/01/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols 1 through 8. 99-04488
06/01/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/18/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Having reviewed the record on appeal, and for the reasons set forth above, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-16362
10/16/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-16472
10/16/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 19, 2000. 00-16472