judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAM F. WEST RANCH, LLC, L.J. TURNER, KAREN TURNER, WENDY TURNER, JENNIFER TURNER, and MICHAEL TURNER v. PATRICK TYRRELL, WYOMING STATE ENGINEER and THE WYOMING BOARD OF CONTROL

Case Heading (S-08-0161)
Case Number:S-08-0161Case Docketed On:07/31/2008
Linked To: S-08-0162
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Water (Title 41)
Short Title:WILLIAM F. WEST RANCH, LLC, L.J. TURNER, KAREN TURNER, WENDY TURNER, JENNIFER TURNER, and MICHAEL TURNER v. PATRICK TYRRELL, WYOMING STATE ENGINEER and THE WYOMING BOARD OF CONTROL
Full Title:WILLIAM F. WEST RANCH, LLC, L.J. TURNER, KAREN TURNER, WENDY TURNER, JENNIFER TURNER, and MICHAEL TURNER, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. PATRICK TYRRELL, WYOMING STATE ENGINEER and THE WYOMING BOARD OF CONTROL, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWilliam F. West Ranch, LLCCatherine M. Fox
Jon Mark Stewart
Sarah Ann Klahn
AppellantL.J. TurnerCatherine M. Fox
Jon Mark Stewart
Sarah Ann Klahn
AppellantKaren TurnerCatherine M. Fox
Jon Mark Stewart
Sarah Ann Klahn
AppellantWendy TurnerCatherine M. Fox
Jon Mark Stewart
Sarah Ann Klahn
AppellantJennifer TurnerCatherine M. Fox
Jon Mark Stewart
Sarah Ann Klahn
AppellantMichael TurnerCatherine M. Fox
Jon Mark Stewart
Sarah Ann Klahn
AppelleeState Engineer's Office - State EngineerBruce A. Salzburg
Jay Arthur Jerde
Peter K. Michael
Marion Jane Yoder
AppelleeState Engineer's Office - Board of Control DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
Jay Arthur Jerde
Peter K. Michael
Marion Jane Yoder
AppelleePennaco Energy, Inc.Brent R. Kunz
John C. Martin
AppelleeDevon Energy Production Company, L.P.Scott P. Klosterman
Margo Harlan Sabec

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Jurisdiction, Water Law
Opinion Number:2009 WY 62
Citation:206 P.3d 722 (Wyo. 2009)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/31/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/31/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/31/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/31/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/16/2008Brief - Appellant and statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
09/16/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant and statement of costs.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/24/2008Order - Consolidating cases and granting, in part, request to participate. Pennaco and Devon Energy will be allowed to file a brief of appellee, however they were not formally added to caption as appellees.OrderConsolidating casesFinal
10/31/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/03/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee StateEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/03/2008Brief - Appellee (Devon Energy & Penneco)BriefAppelleeFinal
11/04/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of Pennaco Energy and Devon EnergyEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/04/2008Event - Phone Call to counsel requesting replacement page 30 with original signatureEventPhone CallFinal
11/05/2008Brief - Other - original signature pageBriefOtherFinal
11/14/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/18/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/18/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' brief in reply to Wyoming State Engineer and the Wyoming Board of Control.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/19/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Marion Yoder for appellees State Engineer and Board of ControlNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/21/2008Brief - Appellant reply - to Devon & Penneco.BriefAppellant replyFinal
11/21/2008Event - Hardcopy received Appellants' Reply to Appellee/Intervenors Pennaco/DevonEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/24/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kate Fox for West and Turner.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Sarah Klahn for West and Turners.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/05/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, five volumes. Volumes I-IV, original papers; Volume V, transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/05/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/18/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full Court (Catherine M. Fox, J. Mark Stewart, argument by Ms. Fox for appellants; Marion Jane Yoder, Peter K. Michael, argument by Ms. Yoder for appellees; John C. Martin, Scott P. Klosterman, argument by Mr. Martin for S-08-0162 appellants) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/18/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/07/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/26/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/26/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/26/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/26/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/28/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 5/27/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal