judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TILLMAN (FRANK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33464
Short Caption:TILLMAN (FRANK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C142807Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/19/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/14/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/14/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00357
01/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 33262, 33289, 33318, 33402, 33463, 33464, 33465, 33479, 33480, 33481, 33523. 99-00320
05/19/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 5/17/99. 99-04082
05/19/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/25/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. we "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn7[ We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-08836
06/20/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-08975
06/20/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/05/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 25, 2001. 01-08975