judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PENNACO ENERGY INC. and DEVON ENERGY PRODUCTION COMPANY, L.P. v. WILLIAM F. WEST RANCH, LLC, L.J. TURNER, KAREN TURNER, WENDY TURNER, JENNIFER TURNER, and MICHAEL TURNER and PATRICK TYRRELL, WYOMING STATE ENGINEER and THE WYOMING BOARD OF CONTROL

Case Heading (S-08-0162)
Case Number:S-08-0162Case Docketed On:07/31/2008
Linked To: S-08-0161
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Water (Title 41)
Short Title:PENNACO ENERGY INC. and DEVON ENERGY PRODUCTION COMPANY, L.P. v. WILLIAM F. WEST RANCH, LLC, L.J. TURNER, KAREN TURNER, WENDY TURNER, JENNIFER TURNER, and MICHAEL TURNER and PATRICK TYRRELL, WYOMING STATE ENGINEER and THE WYOMING BOARD OF CONTROL
Full Title:PENNACO ENERGY INC. and DEVON ENERGY PRODUCTION COMPANY, L.P., Appellants (Intervenors/Defendants), v. WILLIAM F. WEST RANCH, LLC, L.J. TURNER, KAREN TURNER, WENDY TURNER, JENNIFER TURNER, and MICHAEL TURNER, Appellees (Plaintiffs) and PATRICK TYRRELL, WYOMING STATE ENGINEER and THE WYOMING BOARD OF CONTROL, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPennaco Energy, Inc.Brent R. Kunz
John C. Martin
Lucas Evan Buckley
AppellantDevon Energy Production Company, L.P.Scott P. Klosterman
Margo Harlan Sabec
AppelleeWilliam F. West Ranch, LLCCatherine M. Fox
Jon Mark Stewart
Sarah Ann Klahn
AppelleeL.J. TurnerCatherine M. Fox
Jon Mark Stewart
Sarah Ann Klahn
AppelleeKaren TurnerCatherine M. Fox
Jon Mark Stewart
Sarah Ann Klahn
AppelleeWendy TurnerCatherine M. Fox
Jon Mark Stewart
Sarah Ann Klahn
AppelleeJennifer TurnerCatherine M. Fox
Jon Mark Stewart
Sarah Ann Klahn
AppelleeMichael TurnerCatherine M. Fox
Jon Mark Stewart
Sarah Ann Klahn
AppelleeState Engineer's Office - State EngineerBruce A. Salzburg
Jay Arthur Jerde
Peter K. Michael
Marion Jane Yoder
AppelleeState Engineer's Office - Board of Control DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
Jay Arthur Jerde
Peter K. Michael
Marion Jane Yoder

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Jurisdiction, Water Law
Opinion Number:2009 WY 62
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/31/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/31/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/31/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/31/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/04/2008Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
08/04/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees-Plaintiffs' motion and memorandum to dismiss appeal of Pennaco Energy, Inc. and Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/15/2008Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
08/15/2008Event - Hardcopy received memorandum in opposition to motion to dismissEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/26/2008Order - Denying motion to dismiss appealOrderDenyFinal
09/04/2008Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
09/04/2008Event - Hardcopy receivedEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/17/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/17/2008Event - Hardcopy receivedEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/17/2008Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
09/17/2008Event - Hardcopy received - opposition to motion to consolidateEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/24/2008Order - Consolidating cases and granting, in part, request to participate.OrderConsolidating casesFinal
11/03/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/03/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee - Initial brief of William F. West Ranch, LLC, L.J. Turner, Karen Turner, Wendy Turner, Jennifer Turner and Michael TurnerEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/05/2008Brief - Failure to file - appellee StateBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
11/14/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/19/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Marion Yoder for appellees State Engineer and Board of ControlNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/19/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Scott P. Klosterman for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/21/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellants Pennaco Energy Inc. and Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/21/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/24/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kate Fox for West and Turner.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/26/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - John Martin for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Sarah Klahn for West and Turners.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/05/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, five volumes. Volumes I-IV, original papers; Volume V, transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/05/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/18/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full Court (Catherine M. Fox, J. Mark Stewart, argument by Ms. Fox for appellants; Marion Jane Yoder, Peter K. Michael, argument by Ms. Yoder for appellees; John C. Martin, Scott P. Klosterman, argument by Mr. Martin for S-08-0162 appellants) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/18/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/07/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/26/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/26/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/26/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/26/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/28/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 5/27/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal