judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

WILLIAM DEBORD v. LAWRENCE C. MULLER

Case: B-1436
B-1436
03/18/1969
Application for Writ of Error
WILLIAM DEBORD
LAWRENCE C. MULLER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/05/1969Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/30/1969Response to Brief filedPetitioner
06/24/1969Post submission brief filedRespondent
04/02/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
03/18/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/05/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/22/1969Opinion issued
06/30/1969Response to Brief filed
06/24/1969Post submission brief filed
04/16/1969Document received (See Remarks)
04/02/1969Response to Petition
03/18/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/18/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
William DeBordPetitioner
Lawrence C. MullerRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information