judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8091
A-8091
11/02/1960
Application for Writ of Error
K. V. BOOTH
T. H. WILSON, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/02/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/12/1960Reply to ResponsePetitioner
11/19/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
11/07/1960Response to PetitionIntervenor
11/02/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/02/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/12/1960Reply to Response
11/19/1960Response to Petition
11/10/1960Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
11/07/1960Response to Petition
11/02/1960Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/02/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
K. V. BoothPetitioner
T. H. Wilson, et al.Respondent
Marcos Vascocu, Attorney for IntervenorsIntervenor
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information