judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8094
A-8094
11/03/1960
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
JAMES PIERCE AND RAYMOND J. BEALL
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, LOONEY LINDSEY AND HARLAN LONG
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/25/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/16/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
11/15/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
11/15/1960Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
11/14/1960Exhibits in case/cause filed
11/14/1960Exhibits in case/cause filed
11/08/1960Exhibits in case/cause filed
11/03/1960Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filedPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/07/1961Letter Filed
06/27/1961Order from Lower Court filed
05/22/1961Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
03/15/1961Letter Filed
03/13/1961Order from Lower Court filed
03/11/1961Motion for production of documents filed
02/15/1961Motion for emergency stay filedFiling granted
01/30/1961Response to Motion filed
01/25/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/11/1961Opinion issued
11/22/1960Response to Motion filed
11/16/1960Motion to Strike filed
11/16/1960Response to Petition
11/15/1960Response to Petition
11/15/1960Brief in Support of Petition
11/14/1960Exhibits in case/cause filed
11/14/1960Exhibits in case/cause filed
11/14/1960Bond
11/08/1960Exhibits in case/cause filed
11/08/1960Bond
11/08/1960Letter Filed
11/03/1960Order from Lower Court filed
11/03/1960Order from Lower Court filed
11/03/1960Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
James Pierce and Raymond J. BeallPetitioner
Looney Lindsey and Harlan LongRespondent
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANYRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information