judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8095
A-8095
11/01/1960
Application for Writ of Error
GEORGE J. BAUMLER
MRS. DOROTHY B. HAZELWOOD, ADMINISTRATRIX
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/13/1961Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/16/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
11/04/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/20/1961Response to Motion filed
06/13/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/31/1961Opinion issued
12/21/1960Document received (See Remarks)
12/21/1960Document received (See Remarks)
12/21/1960Document received (See Remarks)
11/16/1960Response to Petition
11/04/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/04/1960Document received (See Remarks)
11/01/1960Letter Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
George J. BaumlerPetitioner
Mrs. Dorothy B. Hazelwood, AdministratrixRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information