judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8134
A-8134
11/30/1960
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
C. E. FULTON, ET AL.
MARGARET JOAN BIASIOLLI
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/06/1961Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/03/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
02/08/1961Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
02/08/1961Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
02/08/1961Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
12/15/1960Reply to ResponseRelator
11/30/1960Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/03/1961Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
07/14/1961Opinion issued on motion for rehearing
06/09/1961Response to Motion filed
06/06/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/24/1961Order from Lower Court filed
05/24/1961Opinion issued
03/09/1961Letter Filed
03/03/1961Response to Petition
02/27/1961Motion to Substitute filed
02/08/1961Exhibits in case/cause filed
02/08/1961Exhibits in case/cause filed
02/08/1961Brief in Support of Petition
12/15/1960Reply to Response
12/13/1960Response to Motion filed
11/30/1960Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
C. E. Fulton, et al.Relator
Margaret Joan BiasiolliRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information