judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8088
A-8088
10/24/1960
Application for Writ of Error
J. D. WHEELER, RECIEVER OF TEXAS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, C. H. LANGDEAU, SUCCESSOR RECEIVER OF TEXAS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
AMERICAN NATIONAL BANK OF BEAUMONT, FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF BEAUMONT, 63
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/13/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/11/1961Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/10/1961Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/19/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/17/1961Post submission brief filedPetitioner
05/05/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/05/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/12/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/12/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/05/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/04/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/29/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
12/29/1960Reply to ResponsePetitioner
12/16/1960Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/06/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
12/05/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
11/09/1960Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/24/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/13/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/11/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/10/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/28/1961Opinion issued
05/19/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/17/1961Post submission brief filed
05/05/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/05/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/12/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/12/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/05/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/04/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/29/1961Response to Petition
03/27/1961Response to Motion filed
03/22/1961Motion for extension of time to argue. See remarksFiling granted
03/08/1961Document received (See Remarks)
03/08/1961Document received (See Remarks)
12/29/1960Reply to Response
12/16/1960Amicus Curiae Brief received
12/06/1960Response to Petition
12/05/1960Response to Petition
11/09/1960Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/24/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
10/24/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hubert D. JohnsonAmicus Curiae
J. D. Wheeler, Reciever of Texas Mutual Insurance CompanyPetitioner
First National Bank of BeaumontRespondent
Neth L. Leachman and Henry D. AkinAmicus Curiae
Harold G. KennedyAmicus Curiae
C. H. Langdeau, Successor Receiver of Texas Mutual Insurance CompanyPetitioner
V. F. TaylorAmicus Curiae
Victoria Bank and Trust CompanyAmicus Curiae
63Respondent
American National Bank of BeaumontRespondent
D. H. Zachman, et al.Amicus Curiae
Individual Creditors, to- wit: D. H. Zachman, et al.Amicus Curiae
Bryan LockhartAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information