judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8109
A-8109
11/18/1960
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS, ET AL.
T. W. CAIN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/29/1961Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
08/02/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/01/1961Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
01/06/1961Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/03/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/03/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/06/1960Letter brief Amicus Curiae
11/28/1960Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
11/25/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
11/18/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/29/1961Brief in Support of Petition
08/02/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/19/1961Dissenting opinion issued.
07/19/1961Opinion issued
03/01/1961Supplemental Brief filed
02/08/1961Document received (See Remarks)
02/08/1961Document received (See Remarks)
01/06/1961Reply to Response
01/03/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/03/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
12/07/1960Letter Filed
12/06/1960Letter brief
11/28/1960Supplemental Brief filed
11/25/1960Response to Petition
11/18/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/18/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
T. W. Cain, et al.Respondent
City of GalvestonAmicus Curiae
County of GalvesonAmicus Curiae
State of Texas, et al.Petitioner
Sunday Morning Coffee ClubAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information