judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8080
A-8080
10/20/1960
Application for Writ of Error
M. B. ZEIDMAN, ET UX.
CHAS. A. DAVIS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/17/1961Errata Filed
10/21/1960Response to PetitionRespondent
10/20/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/17/1961Errata Filed
02/01/1961Opinion issued
11/23/1960Document received (See Remarks)
10/21/1960Response to Petition
10/20/1960Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
10/20/1960Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
M. B. Zeidman, et ux.Petitioner
Chas. A. Davis, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information