judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8217
A-8217
01/30/1961
Application for Writ of Error
FLORENCE PARKER, ET AL.
HOUSTON FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/20/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/23/1961Supplement to Petition filedPetitioner
02/10/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
01/30/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/27/1961Response to Motion filed
03/20/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/23/1961Supplement to Petition filed
02/10/1961Response to Petition
01/30/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/30/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Florence Parker, et al.Petitioner
Houston Fire and Casualty Insurance CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information