judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CIFALDI VS. FORD

Case Information: 33461
Short Caption:CIFALDI VS. FORDCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A378093Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/22/1999 / Turner, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/03/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/14/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Mills & Associates-check no. 1946.
12/14/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00355
12/22/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/23/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: November 30, 1998. To Court Reporter: Patsy K. Smith. 98-00497
12/30/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00565
01/11/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from Settlement Judge Israel Kunin. She is unable to accept this appointment due to a conflict. 99-00146
01/22/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: William C. Turner.
03/19/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 11/30/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Patsy K. Smith. 99-02009
05/05/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-03621
05/26/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellants: 70 days to file opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 99-04350
08/04/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 8/3/99. 99-07156
08/04/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 99-07157
08/23/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: October 7, 1999. 99-07834
10/06/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 10/5/99. 99-09586
11/05/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 8, 1999. 99-10882
12/08/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 12/07/99. 99-12282
04/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Submitted date: 04/03/00. 00-05282
04/03/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/18/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. " . . . we reverse the district court's order and remand this matter to the district court for further proceedings consistent with this order." fn2[In light of this disposition, we need not address the additional issues raised by the parties.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-14544
09/13/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14752
09/13/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 4, 2000. 00-14752