judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DANIEL JAMES SPRIGGS, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1319
Short Caption:DANIEL JAMES SPRIGGS, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Lead:10-CF-1319Consolidated: 11-CO-1006
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-23593-09Filed Date:10/26/2010

Opening Event Date:10/26/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/08/2012
Argued/Submitted:06/13/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/29/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDaniel J. Spriggs, Jr.YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Erik KenersonYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/26/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/05/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Sicilia C. Englert, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
11/05/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Sicilia C. Englert, Esquire
12/07/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
02/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (266 pgs/Richer) 7/14-15/10 proc.
02/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (45 pgs/Hunt) 7/16/10 proc.
02/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (211 pgs/Price) 7/19/10 proc.
02/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (170 pgs/Price) 7/20/10 proc.
02/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (178 pgs/Price) 7/21/10 proc.
02/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (153 pgs/Maar) 7/22-23/10 proc.
02/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (22 pgs/tape) 10/15/10 proc. w/cd
02/03/2011RECORD INDEX
02/03/2011RECORD COPIES
02/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/08/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
03/15/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 3/21/11. no oppo
03/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY pending new trail motion in Sup Crt. no oppo
04/01/2011 On consideration of the unopposed motion of appellant for extension of time to file the brief, and the appellant's motion to stay this appeal pending resolution of a D.C. Code 23-110 motion, and on further consideration of this court's administrative order No. M225-05, entered on September 27, 2005, wherein the court announced that it will no longer routinely grant such requests for stay, it is F/O that the motion for extension is granted to the extent that counsel for appellant shall either file the status of the motion in the trial court or the brief and limited appendix on or before July 5, 2011. (ETW)
07/05/2011APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE re status of motion for new trial pending in Sup Crt.
07/29/2011FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant)
08/29/2011LodgedStatus Report regarding pending (Appellant)
09/15/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Consolidating Appeals nos. 10-CF-1319 and 11-CO-1006
09/15/2011FiledInitial Order in appeal no. 11-CO-1006
09/27/2011FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant) (Spriggs) 11-CO-1006
09/30/2011FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (motion for appeal transcript) (Appellant)
10/19/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #8 (38pgs/Lindsay) 7/15/11 proc. w/CD
10/20/2011FiledRecord Copies (11-CO-1006)
10/20/2011FiledRecord Index (11-CO-1006)
10/26/2011FiledBriefing Order
12/05/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
12/05/2011FiledAppendix (Attached to Brief) (Appellant)
12/23/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
01/09/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 2/8/12.
02/08/2012FiledBrief with attached Exhibit A (CD) (Appellee)
02/08/2012FiledBriefing Completed
02/29/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
03/20/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
03/29/2012LodgedACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/29/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte setting for oral argument.
05/29/2012FiledCalendar notice sent
06/13/2012FiledArgued before Judges Fisher, Beckwith, Steadman Sicilia C. Englert, Esq. for appellant Erik Kenerson, Esq. for appellee
09/20/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
10/01/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (Appellant)Granted
10/11/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Spriggs) (Appellant)
10/22/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion For Extension Of Time to File petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc to 11/1/12.
11/29/2012FiledOrdered that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith.
11/29/2012FiledMandate