judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

E. MICHAEL LIEBERMAN v. STEVEN A. MOSSBROOK, FORREST R. SPROUT, SANDRA S. MOSSBROOK, MICHAEL JAMES FORD AND THE MICHAEL JAMES FORD TRUST OF SEPTEMBER 24, 1983 AS SUCCESSOR TO THE RIVERTON ORTHOPEDIC CLINIC PENSION PLAN, and RIVERTON ORTHOPEDIC RETIREMENT PLAN

Case Heading (S-08-0159)
Case Number:S-08-0159Case Docketed On:07/30/2008
Linked To: S-08-0160
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Corporations, Partnerships and Associations (Title 17)
Short Title:E. MICHAEL LIEBERMAN v. STEVEN A. MOSSBROOK, FORREST R. SPROUT, SANDRA S. MOSSBROOK, MICHAEL JAMES FORD AND THE MICHAEL JAMES FORD TRUST OF SEPTEMBER 24, 1983 AS SUCCESSOR TO THE RIVERTON ORTHOPEDIC CLINIC PENSION PLAN, and RIVERTON ORTHOPEDIC RETIREMENT PLAN
Full Title:E. MICHAEL LIEBERMAN, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. STEVEN A. MOSSBROOK, FORREST R. SPROUT, SANDRA S. MOSSBROOK, MICHAEL JAMES FORD AND THE MICHAEL JAMES FORD TRUST OF SEPTEMBER 24, 1983 AS SUCCESSOR TO THE RIVERTON ORTHOPEDIC CLINIC PENSION PLAN, and RIVERTON ORTHOPEDIC RETIREMENT PLAN, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantE. Michael LiebermanWilliam D. Bagley
AppelleeSteven A. MossbrookAlexander K. Davison
Terry Wynn Connolly
AppelleeForrest R. SproutAlexander K. Davison
Terry Wynn Connolly
AppelleeSandra S. MossbrookAlexander K. Davison
Terry Wynn Connolly
AppelleeRiverton Orthopedic Retirement PlanAlexander K. Davison
Terry Wynn Connolly
AppelleeMichael James FordAlexander K. Davison
Terry Wynn Connolly

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Corporations/Partnership/Limited Liability Entities, Limitation of Actions, Trial - Damages
Opinion Number:2009 WY 65
Citation:208 P.3d 1296 (Wyo. 2009)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/30/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/30/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/30/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/31/2008Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
08/07/2008Notice-Internal - Other - letter from Chief Justice to CounselNotice-InternalOtherFinal
09/12/2008Brief - Appellant and statement of costsBriefAppellantFinal
09/15/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/13/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/13/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file appellees' response brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/14/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/26/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/26/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellees.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/10/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
12/10/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Reply of Appellant E. Michael LiebermanEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/12/2008Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
12/15/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Combine CasesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/16/2008Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
12/22/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, five volumes. Volumes I-III, original papers; Volume IV, transcripts; Volume V, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/22/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/09/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - William Bagley for appellant Lieberman; and Alexander Davison for appellees Mossbrook, et al.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/18/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (William D. Bagley for appellant Lieberman; Terry Wynn Connolly and Alexander K. Davison, argument by Mr. Davison for appellees Mossbrook, et al.) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/18/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/19/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirmed in part and reversed in part, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/02/2009Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
06/02/2009Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
06/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Application for RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/23/2009Order - Denying motion for recovery of costsOrderDenyFinal
06/23/2009Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
06/23/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/23/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/23/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/23/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/26/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 6/24/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal