judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BARRICK GOLDSTRIKE MINE VS. PETERSON

Case Information: 33460
Short Caption:BARRICK GOLDSTRIKE MINE VS. PETERSONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9800085AClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:01/08/1999 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:03/30/2000 at 9:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/30/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/14/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from McDonald Carano Wilson McCune Bergin Frankovich & Hicks--check no. 0019458.
12/14/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00354
12/22/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Larry R. Hicks. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/24/1998Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 98-00511
12/29/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00546
01/08/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt.
02/22/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-01173
02/26/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellants: 70 days to file opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 99-01317
05/07/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: 6/7/99. 99-03669
06/07/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Reno/Carson Msgr 6/7/99. 99-04756
06/07/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 99-04757
07/19/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: August 11, 1999. 99-06429
08/12/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 8/11/99. 99-07462
08/16/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance. 99-07591
09/09/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Reno/Carson Msgr. 9/9/99. 99-08492
02/02/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for March 30, 2000 at the hour of 9:00 a.m. for 1/2 hour in Carson City. (En Banc) 00-01644
03/15/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 00-04089
03/30/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. RR/CY/WM/MS/DA/ML/NB
06/09/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Per Curiam. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 64. En Banc. RR/CY/WM/MS/DA/ML/NB 00-09722
07/06/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-11418
07/06/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/19/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 7, 2000. 00-11418