judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EDWARD OLYNN TAYLOR v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0158)
Case Number:S-08-0158Case Docketed On:07/30/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:EDWARD OLYNN TAYLOR v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:EDWARD OLYNN TAYLOR, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantEdward Olynn TaylorDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Eric Alan Johnson
Charles F. Pelkey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Evidence
Opinion Number:2009 WY 31
Citation:203 P.3d 408

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/30/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/30/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/16/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/17/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/19/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from counsel for appellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/30/2008Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Charles F. Pekley to appear on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
10/30/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/31/2008Event - Hardcopy received -brief of appellee, consent and approval and designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/14/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/17/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk Morgan for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Charles Pelkey, Student Intern for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/05/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
12/05/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, five volumes. Volumes I-III, original papers; Volume IV, pre-sentence investigation; Volume V, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/05/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/17/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full Court (Kirk Allan Morgan for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Charles F. Pelkey, Student Intern, argument by Mr. Pelkey for appellee) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
12/17/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/06/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/24/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/24/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/26/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/25/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal