judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8213
A-8213
01/26/1961
Application for Writ of Error
ATLANTIC INSURANCE COMPANY
VIVIAN BOYETTE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/28/1961Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
03/08/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/04/1961Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/27/1961Supplement to Petition filedRespondent
02/26/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
02/08/1961Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/01/1961Response to PetitionPetitioner
01/26/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
01/26/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/28/1961Brief in Support of Petition
03/08/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/04/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/27/1961Supplement to Petition filed
02/26/1961Response to Petition
02/08/1961Reply to Response
02/01/1961Response to Petition
01/26/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/26/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/26/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
VIvian BoyetteRespondent
Atlantic Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information